Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007136243 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8345516 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2013 | B2 | US2012257483 | 11.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | US30195810 | 25.10.2010 | US201113290635 | 07.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8054713 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2011 | B2 | US2011058458 | 10.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101276501B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2013 | B1 | KR20090086904 | 14.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5732194B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B2 | JP2009538490 | 05.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2030202 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2010 | B1 | EP2030202 | 04.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE478419T | 15.09.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2653437 | 15.07.2014 | C | CA2653437 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101529514B | 23.01.2013 | B | CN101529514 | 09.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006016347D1 | 30.09.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL195450 | 28.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006NL00264 | 24.05.2006 |