EP1907948 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN A DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obigo Korea Co., Ltd. 621-2 Yeoksam 1-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | [2010/04] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Teleca Korea Co. Raum Art Center Building 621-2 Yeoksam 1 dong Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-908 / KR | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Obigo AB Scheelevägen 17 223 70 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMBLADH, Johan Bytaregatan 19 S-222 21 Lund / SE | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Greene, Simon Kenneth, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2009/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/15] | Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel Awapatent AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 06757993.8 | 26.06.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006SE00774 | Priority number, date | SE20050001710 | 20.07.2005 Original published format: SE 0501710 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007011277 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907948 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907948 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/21, G06F17/22 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
G06F16/9577 (EP,US);
G06F40/103 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG IN EINEM DISPLAY-SYSTEM | [2008/15] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN A DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2008/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT SITUE DANS UN SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE ET METHODE ASSOCIEE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 03.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2006 | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | IT | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | ES | 30.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | IE | 26.06.2012 | LU | 26.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
LU | 26.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004148571 (LUE VINCENT WEN-JENG [US]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XA] - Karnaze C, "Table Reflow Internals - Tech Talk", (20020805), URL: http://lxr.mozilla.org/seamonkey/source/layout/doc/table_reflow_slides.html, (20100420), XP002578991 [X] 11-14 * the whole document * [A] 1-10 | [A] - Anonymous, "An Overview of WebCore", (20050326), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20050326142041/http://weblogs.mozillazine.org/hyatt/WebCore/chapter2.html, (20100421), XP002578992 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - GESSNER R, "Netscape's Gecko : The Next-Generation Layout Engine", INTERNET CITATION, (1999), URL: http://webtechniques.com/archives/1999/03/gessner/, (20010504), XP002166474 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - Waterson C, "Gecko Overview", (20020610), URL: http://www.mozilla.org/newlayout/doc/gecko-overview.ppt, (20100421), XP002578993 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6635089 (BURKETT CHARLES [US], et al); | [X]WO03088035 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]US2004148571 (LUE VINCENT WEN-JENG [US]); | [A]US2005071364 (XIE XING [CN], et al) |