EP1874873 - SPARKLE EFFECT OF UNIQUE PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2016/39] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states BASF Catalysts LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAGALA, Frank, Sr. 2763 Rt. 52 Hopewell Junction, New York 12533 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/49] | Ellwanger, Arndt, et al Ellwanger & Baier Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Ziegler, Verena, et al Ellwanger & Kern Patentanwälte Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Ellwanger, Arndt, et al Ellwanger & Kern Patentanwälte Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Huhn, Michael Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Huhn, Michael Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06758255.1 | 31.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US12187 | Priority number, date | US20060277897 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: US 277897 | US20050667276P | 01.04.2005 Original published format: US 667276 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006110359 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874873 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874873 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09D5/36, A61K8/29, A61Q1/02, A61K8/02 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
C09C1/0021 (EP,US);
C09C1/00 (KR);
A61K8/0266 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
C08K9/00 (KR);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/436 (EP,US);
A61K2800/621 (EP,US);
A61K2800/651 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1004 (EP,US);
C09C2200/102 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1087 (EP,US);
C09C2200/307 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | C09C1/00, C09D5/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GLITZEREFFEKT EINER EINZIGARTIGEN TEILCHENGRÖSSENVERTEILUNG | [2008/02] | English: | SPARKLE EFFECT OF UNIQUE PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION | [2008/02] | French: | PIGMENTS A EFFET LUISANT A DISTRIBUTION GRANULOMETRIQUE UNIQUE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Observations by third parties | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19197332.0 / EP3611230 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2020
13.12.2023
WITHDRAWN ECKART GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE Opponent's representative Strych, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2020/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2020
05.08.2020
ADMISSIBLE ECKART GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE Opponent's representative Strych, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | 20.08.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.12.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.09.2024 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/43] | Appeal following opposition | 10.03.2022 | Appeal received No. T0657/22 | 10.03.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 09.05.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.09.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 12.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2006 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | IE | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | LU | 31.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/12] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
LU | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
LU | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2002155243 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-8,10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0024] , [0025] , [0029] - [0035] - [0049] - [0051]; claims 1-6; table 1 * [Y] 9; | [XAY]JP2002155240 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0041] - [0043]; claims 1-4; table 1 * [A] 5 [Y] 9; | [XAY]JP2002155241 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0049] - [0051]; claims 1-4; table 1 * [A] 5 [Y] 9; | [XAY]JP2002155242 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] - [0044] - [0049]; claims 1-5; table 1 * [A] 5 [Y] 9; | [YA]US6132873 (DIETZ JOHANN [DE], et al) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 16 - line 64; claims 1,8,14,15 * [A] 1-8,10; | [A]US2004123778 (BAGALA FRANK [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] - [0014] , [0029] , [0030]; examples 21-42 * | [YA] - DR R RÜGER ET AL, "Cosmetic Formulations containing Special Effect Pigments", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200307), vol. 471, no. 1, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007132958 [Y] 9 * [Introduction, page 1], [Glass flakes, page 3 to 4] * [A] 1-8,10 | other | US4321087 | EP0826745 | - Kopie Produktbroschüre Firemist Special effect der Fa. Engelhard Corporation., XP003029886 | - Kopie Technisches Datanblatt Firemist-Pigmente Firemist Super Red 9G430M, XP003029887 | - Kopie Technisches Datanblatt Firemist-Pigmente Firemist Super Blue 9G630M., XP003029888 | - Kopie Technisches Datanblatt Firemist-Pigmente Firemist Super Gold 9G230M., XP003029889 | - Kopie Produktbrochüre "SunSHINE Color Effect Pigments" der Fa. SunChemical., XP003029890 | - The trend toward pearl colors offered by SKY Chemical, SKY COSMETIC PEARL product List., XP003029891 | Opposition | US3331699 | EP0246523 | EP0307747 | WO9746624 | US6132873 | JP2002155243 | JP2002155240 | JP2002155241 | JP2002155242 | WO02090448 | WO03006558 | WO2004024444 | US2004123778 | EP1550550 | - Anonymous, "Produktinformation ''Firemist® - Special effect pigments", Engelhard, (20040000), pages 1 - 4, XP055751004 | - Anonymous, "Produktinformation Firemist® Super Gold 9G230M", BASF THE CHEMICAL COMPANY, (20100500), pages 1 - 3, XP055751010 | - Anonymous, "Produktinformation ''Sun Shine Color Effect Pigments''", Eckart, pages 1 - 14 | - Anonymous, "Special-effect pigments for improved performance in automotive paints", European Coatings Journal, (20031000), page 68, XP055751014 |