EP1874756 - CHROMANE AND CHROMENE DERIVATIVES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEFFERNAN, Gavin, David 616 East Sixth Street Florence, New Jersey 08518 / US | 02 /
STACK, Gary, Paul 525 Brookfield Lane Ambler, Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 03 /
GROSS, Jonathan, Laird 25 Washington Drive Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, Dahui 27 Christian Drive East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US | 05 /
GAO, Hong 24 Reid Avenue Belle Mead, New Jersey 08502 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Mannion, Sally Kim Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Mannion, Sally Kim Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06758490.4 | 21.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US15208 | Priority number, date | US20050673820P | 22.04.2005 Original published format: US 673820 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006116165 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874756 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D311/04, C07D311/20, C07D313/08, A61K31/353, A61P25/24 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07D311/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/353 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P5/34 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D311/20 (EP,US);
C07D311/58 (EP,US);
C07D313/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHROMAN- UND CHROMEN-DERIVATE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2008/02] | English: | CHROMANE AND CHROMENE DERIVATIVES AND USES THEREOF | [2008/02] | French: | DERIVES DE CHROMANE ET DE CHROMENE, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 22.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03029238 (WYETH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-37 * example - *; | [Y]WO03029239 (WYETH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-37 * example - *; | [Y]WO03031439 (WYETH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-37 * example - *; | [PA]WO2005044812 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-37* example - * |