EP1874850 - FRICTION MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Borgwarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Robert, C. 1307 Tulberry Circle Rochester, MI 48306 / US | 02 /
DONG, Feng 4273 Calumet Drive Rochester, MI 48306 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Bennett, Adrian Robert J., et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06758609.9 | 25.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US15769 | Priority number, date | US20050674934P | 26.04.2005 Original published format: US 674934 P | US20050723314P | 04.10.2005 Original published format: US 723314 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006116474 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874850 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874850 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/00, C08J5/14 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
F16D69/026 (EP,US);
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08J5/04 (EP,US);
D06M11/74 (EP,US);
D06M11/79 (EP,US);
C08J2361/00 (EP,US);
F16D13/60 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | C08J5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/35] |
Former [2008/43] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REIBUNGSMATERIAL | [2008/02] | English: | FRICTION MATERIAL | [2008/02] | French: | MATERIAU DE FRICTION | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 26.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004217790 ; | [X]JPH06240233 ; | [X]JPH059458 ; | [X]JPH01307529 ; | [X]JPS6366230 ; | [X]EP0640774 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1-35 * examples 1-4; claims 1-12 *; | [X]US2005039872 (KIMURA MUTSUKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-35 * example 1; claims 1-5 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 57, Database accession no. 2004-584450, XP002479308 & JP2004217790 A 20040805 (DAINAX KK) [X] 1-35 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 39, Database accession no. 1994-313951, XP002479309 & JPH06240233 A 19940830 (TOSHIBA TUNGALLOY KK) [X] 1-35 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 08, Database accession no. 1993-061843, XP002479310 & JPH059458 A 19930119 (TOSHIBA PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1-35 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 04, Database accession no. 1990-027926, XP002479311 & JPH01307529 A 19891212 (AISHIN KAKO KK) [X] 1-35 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 18, Database accession no. 1988-122672, XP002479312 & JPS6366230 A 19880324 (AISHIN KAKO KK) [X] 1-35 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5540621 (KEESTER LOUIS J [US], et al); | [Y]US6284815 (SASAHARA SHIGEMI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005004258 (YAMAMOTO KAZUHIDE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005075413 (LAM ROBERT C [US]) | by applicant | JPS6366230 | JPH01307529 | JPH059458 | JPH06240233 | EP0640774 | US6284815 | JP2004217790 | US2005004258 | US2005039872 | US2005075413 |