EP1884130 - DYNAMIC GENERATION OF CSI FOR INBOUND ROAMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roamware, Inc. 3031 Tisch Way, Suite 1000 San Jose, CA 95128 / US | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Yue, Jun 4114 Sugar Maple Drive Danville, CA 94506 / US | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Wallis, Helen Frances Mary, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Wallis, Helen Frances Mary, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2008/06] | Wallis, Helen Frances Mary, et al Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 06759183.4 | 08.05.2006 | [2008/06] | WO2006US17481 | Priority number, date | US20050679444P | 09.05.2005 Original published format: US 679444 P | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006121894 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1884130 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884130 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/06 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
H04W8/06 (EP,US);
H04W8/20 (EP,US);
H04W8/12 (EP,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,US);
H04W92/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/06] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ERZEUGUNG VON CSI FÜR ANKOMMENDE ROAMER | [2008/06] | English: | DYNAMIC GENERATION OF CSI FOR INBOUND ROAMERS | [2008/06] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DYNAMIQUE DE CSI POUR ABONNÉS ITINÉRANTS ENTRANTS | [2008/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 16.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2009 | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | IT | 20.10.2010 | LT | 20.10.2010 | LV | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | PL | 20.10.2010 | RO | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | BG | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | IS | 20.02.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | IE | 08.05.2011 | LU | 08.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | FR | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/26] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 08.05.2011 | ||
LU | 08.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 08.05.2011 | ||
LU | 08.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 08.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 08.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | BE | 20.10.2010 | |
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 20.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0056085 (STAR HOME GMBH [CH], et al) [X] 1,5-8,10-19,21-25,27-45,47-49 * page 11, lines 14-18,23,24 * * page 14, lines 9-11 * * page 19, line 17 - page 20, line 6 * * page 22, line 17 - page 23, line 5 *; | [Y]WO0165884 (MARKPORT LTD [IE], et al) [Y] 2-4,20 * page 2, lines 9,10 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 7 * * figures 1,5 *; | [XY]EP1389024 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,5-8,10-19,21-25,27-45,47-49 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] * [Y] 2-4,20; | [PX]EP1622403 (STAR HOME GMBH [CH]) [PX] 1-3,12-15,17,19-21,29-32,43-45,47-49 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0040] * * figure 1 *; | [E]GB2424493 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1,12,13,19,21,29,30,43,45,47-49 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 21 * * page 8, line 18 - page 10, line 10 * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 8 * * figures 3,6 *; | [X] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Customised Applications for Mobile network Enhanced Logic (CAMEL) Phase 2; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 03.78 version 7.8.1 Release 1998); ETSI TS 101 441", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20020801), vol. 3-CN2;SMG3, no. V7.8.1, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014016036 [X] 1,5-8,10-19,21-25,27-45,47-49 * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 11 * * page 19, lines 18-26 * * section 9.9.2 * * section 9.10.3 * | [A] - BECHER R ET AL, "CAMEL: THE IMPACT OF PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS ON INTELLIGENT NETWORKS", ISS '97. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM). GLOBAL NETWORK EVOLUTION: CONVERGENCE OR COLLISION? TORONTO, SEPT. 21 - 26, 1997; [ISS. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM)], TORONTO,, (19970921), pages 225 - 233, XP000704472 [A] 1-49 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2003072425 (HURST MICHAEL [GB]); | [X]WO2004075579 (ROAMWARE INC [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1389024 |