EP2015889 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. P.O. Box 482 Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US | [2009/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITWORTH, Denver 7504 Crosstimbers Ln. North Richland Hills, TX 76180 / US | 02 /
FRENCH, Brian 1448 Grape Arbor Ct. Roanoke, TX 76262 / US | 03 /
CRIBB, Vance 2704 Waltham Dr. Grapevine, TX 76051 / US | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/04] | Lecomte, Didier Lecomte & Partners Sàrl B.P. 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 06759562.9 | 11.05.2006 | [2009/04] | WO2006US18240 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007133198 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015889 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2015889 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/01, B23P6/00, // B29C73/04, B64F5/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
B23P6/00 (EP,US);
B29C73/06 (EP,US);
B64F5/40 (EP,US);
F16B11/006 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1056 (EP,US);
Y10T428/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/04] | B23K31/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/23] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR VON BAUTEILEN | [2009/04] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS | [2009/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉPARER DES COMPOSANTS STRUCTURAUX | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 12.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3252493 (SMITH JOSEPH D) [Y] 2,7,23 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4577450 (LARGE DAVID T [US]) [X] 1,3-6,9,11-14,16-18,20,21,24-26,29-32 * figures 3,14,15 * * column 3, line 46 - line 50 * * column 5, line 36 - line 56 * * column 7, line 10 - line 29 * * column 9, line 12 - line 37 * [Y] 2,7,8,10,15,19,22,23,27,28; | [Y]GB2169372 (REXNORD INC) [Y] 8,10,15,19,22,27* page 2, line 79 - line 93; figure 3 *; | [XY]US5093957 (DO HIEN D [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 46 * [Y] 28; | [X]US2005125946 (SUCIC STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,11,12,15-17,20,25,30 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0035] , [0036]; figures 3,4 * | International search | [A]US5067234 (FRASER MICHAEL J [GB]); | [A]US4614296 (LESGOURGUES JACQUES [FR]) | Examination | JPH08169057 | - BAKER A A ED - MIDDLETON DONALD H, Repair Techniques for Composite Structures, COMPOSITE MATERIALS IN AIRCRAFT STRUCTURES, LONGMAN, NEW YORK, PAGE(S) 207 - 227, (19900101), ISBN 978-0-582-01712-2, XP008103764 | by applicant | US4577450 | US2005125946 |