EP1907691 - TURBINE WHEEL FOR CROSS-FLOW TURBINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Popp, Hans Georg Bahnhofstrasse 22/1 8112 Gratwein / AT | [2009/25] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Kneissl, Josef Laufnitzdorf 201 8130 Frohnleiten / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Engerthstraße 146/3/1 1200 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Teschnergasse 33/1/3 1180 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2008/15] | Miksovsky, Alexander Patentanwälte Miksovsky & Pollhammer OEG, Währingerstrasse 3 1096 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06760797.8 | 21.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006AT00310 | Priority number, date | AT20050000502U | 22.07.2005 Original published format: AT 50205 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2008/15] | AT20050000502U | 22.07.2005 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009148 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907691 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F03B3/12, F03B15/02, F03B11/04 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
F03B3/125 (EP);
F03B11/04 (EP);
F03B15/02 (EP);
Y02E10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | TURBINENLAUFRAD FÜR DURCHSTRÖMTURBINEN | [2008/15] | English: | TURBINE WHEEL FOR CROSS-FLOW TURBINES | [2008/15] | French: | ROTOR DE TURBINE A IMPULSIONS RADIALES | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2008 | 31.07.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXL]WO2006007622 (KNEISSL JOSEF [AT], et al) [PXL] 1,5-7 * page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 17; figure 6; claims 1,2,9,10,17-21 *; | [X]FR2513312 (BEDUE ABEL [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 26 - line 32 * * page 3, line 10 - line 16 * * page 4, line 1 - line 38; figure - *; | [X]FR2226025 (BERRY ETS [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 6; figures 1,5-8 *; | [X]DE66025 (A. LINNENBRÜGGE) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]DE126520 (A. WIEDEMANN) [X] 1 * column W *; | [A]US1889816 (ALBERT WHITE WILLIAM) [A] 1 * page 2, line 3 - line 34; figure 4 * |