EP1907648 - STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS MADE FROM SYNTACTIC FOAM SANDWICH PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOC Composites Pty Ltd 398 Nursery Road Holland Park, QLD 4121 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Loc Composites Pty Ltd 398 Nursery Road Holland Park, QLD 4121 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWNE, Darren James C/-LOC Composites Pty Ltd Handley St., P5 Block Toowoomba, Queensland 4350 / AU | [2010/09] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
BROWNE, Darren James 3 Banyula Drive Toowoomba, Queensland 4350 / AU | Representative(s) | Plöger, Jan Manfred, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Plöger, Jan Manfred, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 06760913.1 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006AU01052 | Priority number, date | AU20050903962 | 26.07.2005 Original published format: AU 2005903962 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007012127 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1907648 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/10, E04C2/26, E04C2/24, E04C2/38 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
E04C3/291 (EP,US);
E01D2/00 (EP,US);
E04B5/026 (EP,US);
E04B5/04 (EP,US);
E04C3/28 (EP,US);
E01D2101/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS SANDWICHPLATTEN AUS SYNTAKTISCHEM SCHAUMSTOFF HERGESTELLTE TRAGELEMENTE | [2008/15] | English: | STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS MADE FROM SYNTACTIC FOAM SANDWICH PANELS | [2008/15] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS STRUCTURAUX CONSTITUÉS DE PANNEAUX SANDWICH À MOUSSE SYNTACTIQUE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 08.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3707434 (STAYNER VANCE A) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8-12 * column 3, line 75 - column 4, line 22; figure 2 *; | [Y]GB2004501 (BUCH KOELZER OHG) [Y] 1-3,5,8,10-12 * page 3, lines 33-41,73-94; figure 2 *; | [Y]US4463043 (REEVES JOHN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,7,8,10-12 * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 7; figure 13 *; | [Y]US4978562 (WYCECH JOSEPH S [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,10-12 * column 3, lines 48-68 *; | [X]US5612117 (BELANGER GERMAIN [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12 * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 18; figures 2-3 *; | [Y]EP0922568 (ELECTROACUSTICA GENERAL IBERIC [ES]) [Y] 1-3,5,10-12 * paragraph [0011]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6408594 (PORTER WILLIAM H [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-12 * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 7; figure 13 *; | [Y]WO2005056948 (UNIV SOUTHERN QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [Y] 5* figure 3; claim 1 * | International search | [X]NL1023445C ; | [X]FR2275605 (ALLARD FRANCOIS [FR]); | [X]EP0328921 ; | [X]GB2251008 (MILL PETER ARTHUR DONALDSON); | [X]US5373674 (WINTER IV AMOS G [US]); | [X]CA2334589 (JELD WEN INC [US]); | [X]US2003082365 (GEARY JOHN R [US], et al); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 12, Database accession no. 2005-108933, XP003010626 & NL1023445C C 20041117 (COMPOSETEN TEAM BV) |