EP1913340 - MEASURING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kistler Holding AG Eulachstrasse 22 8408 Winterthur / CH | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSSHARD, Reinhard Hüssenbüelstrasse 30 CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | 02 /
ENGELER, Paul Allmendweg 13 CH-8500 Frauenfeld / CH | 03 /
PLETSCHER, Ernst Kleiment 333 CH-8460 Marthalen / CH | 04 /
WASER, Max P. Dichterweg 5 8335 Hittnau / CH | [2008/17] | Application number, filing date | 06761253.1 | 03.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006CH00402 | Priority number, date | CH20050001324 | 10.08.2005 Original published format: CH 13242005 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007016799 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913340 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01D21/02, G01D3/02 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G01D21/02 (EP,US);
G01D3/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | MESSANORDNUNG | [2008/17] | English: | MEASURING ARRANGEMENT | [2008/17] | French: | SYSTEME DE MESURE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2011 | Observations by third parties | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4972099 (AMANO HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6115654 (EID BRADLEY FRANZ [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 4, line 10 - column 7, line 27 * | other | EP0960012 |