EP1917911 - AN IMAGING DEVICE FOR A RADIOTHERAPY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hui, Xiaobing F/5 Tower B Intelig Tech. Digital Park, Jin hua Road Futian Guangdong 518038 / CN | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Zhi F/5 Tower B, Intelig Tech. Digital Park Jin hua Road Futian Trade-Free Zone Futian District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518038 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Jian F/5 Tower B, Intelig Tech. Digital Park Jin hua Road Futian Trade-Free Zone Futian District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518038 / CN | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Fletcher, Matthew James Edwin, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Fletcher, Matthew James Edwin, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray, Chartered Patent Attorneys, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06761344.8 | 03.07.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006CN01540 | Priority number, date | CN2005136680 | 25.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510036680 | [2008/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007022680 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1917911 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, A61B6/00, A61B6/03, A61B6/06 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/035 (EP,US);
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/4007 (EP,US);
A61N5/1084 (EP,US);
A61B6/4458 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/19] | A61B6/00, A61N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN STRAHLENTHERAPIESYSTEM | [2008/19] | English: | AN IMAGING DEVICE FOR A RADIOTHERAPY SYSTEM | [2008/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/19] | DISPOSITIF D`IMAGERIE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2007 | Translation filed | 27.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 23.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2012 | 31.07.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2013 | 31.07.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6463122 (MOORE JOHN FITZALLEN [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 43 - column 5, line 22 * [I] 6,8,9; | [A]US2003048868 (BAILEY ERIC M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 ** paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US2004005027 (NAFSTADIUS PEDER [SE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 2-4,6 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * | International search | [Y]US5724400 (SWERDLOFF STUART [US], et al); | [Y]CN1275410 (SHENZHEN AOWO INTERNAT SCIENCE [CN]); | [A]CN1318347 (SHANDONG XINHUA MEDICAL EQUIPM [CN]); | [A]CN1387449 (MURADIN ABUKEBIROVICH KUMAKHOV [RU]); | [A]WO2004064641 (ELEKTA AB [SE], et al) | Examination | EP1057499 | US6325537 |