EP1899036 - GAS INTAKE ZONE OF A GAS FILTER HOUSING, USED AS A PREFILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/33] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTHER, Thilo Otto-Gessler-Strasse 22 71698 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
STEHLIG, Jürgen Reuschweg 13/1 72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE | 03 /
TRAUB, Matthias Zavelsteiner Strasse 30 71034 Böblingen / DE | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/18] | 01 /
ROTHER, Thilo Otto-Gessler-Strasse 22 71698 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
02 /
STEHLIG, Jürgen Hohenneuffenstrasse 30 72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE | |||
03 /
TRAUB, Matthias Zavelsteiner Strasse 30 71034 Böblingen / DE | |||
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
ROTHER, Thilo Otto-Gessler-Strasse 22 71698 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
02 /
STEHLIG, Jürgen Hohenneuffenstrasse 30 72666 Neckartailfingen / DE | |||
03 /
TRAUB, Matthias Zavelsteiner Strasse 30 71034 Böblingen / DE | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Königstrasse 28 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06761689.6 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006DE01068 | Priority number, date | DE20051031059 | 02.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005031059 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007003158 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1899036 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899036 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/16, F02M35/022, B04C3/04 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B01D45/16 (EP,US);
B01D46/525 (EP,US);
B01D50/20 (EP,US);
B04C3/00 (EP,US);
B04C3/04 (EP,US);
F02M35/022 (EP,US);
B01D2265/028 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/12] | B01D45/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/41] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ALS VORFILTER DIENENDER GASEINTRITTSBEREICH EINES GASFILTERGEHÄUSES | [2008/12] | English: | GAS INTAKE ZONE OF A GAS FILTER HOUSING, USED AS A PREFILTER | [2008/12] | French: | ZONE D'ENTREE DES GAZ D'UN CORPS DE FILTRE A GAZ UTILISE COMME PRE-FILTRE | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 17.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2918765 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1063400 (SVENSKA FLAEKTFABRIKEN AB) [A] * figure - *; | [A]EP1500423 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] * figure - *; | [A]US4746340 (DURRE REYNOLD F [US], et al) [A] * figure - *; | [A]US4537608 (KOSLOW EVAN E [US]) [A] * figure - *; | [A]US4008059 (MONSON DONALD R, et al) [A] * figure - *; | [A]DE10235761 (STIHL MASCHF ANDREAS [DE]) [A] * figure - * |