EP1893987 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF THE CETANE NUMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilharm, Peter, Dr. Trentiner Ring 30 86356 Neusäss-Täfertingen / DE | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762075.7 | 19.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006EP05842 | Priority number, date | DE20051028706 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028706 | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136349 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893987 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893987 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/52 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/2829 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPARATUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN CETANZAHLBESTIMMUNG | [2008/10] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF THE CETANE NUMBER | [2008/10] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION AUTOMATIQUE DE L'INDICE DE CETANE | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2006 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 11.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IE | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | LV | 31.12.2008 | PL | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | ES | 11.04.2009 | IS | 30.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | LU | 19.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
LU | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
LU | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4010358 (MORRIS WILLIAM EMERY) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 26 - line 29 * * column 8, line 28 - line 36 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5457985 (CELLIER JOSEPH [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19701288 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 16 * * figure - *; | [A]DE19712921 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 36 - line 41 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0214456 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [A] 1-12* page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 11 *; | [A] - "ASTM D 6890 - 04", ASTM DESIGNATION, ASTM INTERNATIOANL, US, (200405), XP008068567 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [10.3.3] * * figure - * |