EP1899536 - VIBRATING PLATE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Neuson SE Preußenstrasse 41 80809 München / DE | [2009/19] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Wacker Construction Equipment AG Preussenstrasse 41 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Richthofen, Thorsten Brucknerstrasse 24 81677 München / DE | 02 /
KOLMAR, Oliver Hauptstrasse 58A 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 03 /
STEFFEN, Michael Friedrich-Loy-Strasse 11 80796 München / DE | 04 /
LACHENMAIER, Thomas Ahornring 3 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/18] | 01 /
von Richthofen, Thorsten Friedrich-Loy-Strasse 11 80796 München / DE | ||
02 /
KOLMAR, Oliver Hauptstrasse 58A 85579 Neubiberg / DE | |||
03 /
STEFFEN, Michael Friedrich-Loy-Strasse 11 80796 München / DE | |||
04 /
LACHENMAIER, Thomas Ahornring 3 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | |||
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
von Richthofen, Thorsten Friedrich-Loy-Strasse 11 80796 München / DE | ||
02 /
KOLMAR, Oliver Hauptstrasse 58A 85579 Neubiberg / DE | |||
03 /
STEFFEN, Michael Türkenstrasse 57 80799 München / DE | |||
04 /
LACHENMAIER, Thomas Ahornring 3 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762306.6 | 30.06.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006EP06372 | Priority number, date | DE20051030860 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005030860 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003368 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899536 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899536 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E02D3/074, E01C19/38 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
E02D3/074 (EP,US);
E01C19/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [2008/31] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIBRATIONSPLATTENSYSTEM | [2008/12] | English: | VIBRATING PLATE SYSTEM | [2008/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE PLAQUES VIBRANTES | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 02.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 19.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE10053446 (WACKER WERKE KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB805643 (LOSENHAUSENWERK DUESSELDORFER) [A] 1 * the whole document * |