EP1910151 - ELECTROHYDRAULIC STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Heidehofstrasse 31 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIENER, Rainer Erlenbacher Strasse 9 97854 Steinfeld / DE | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG Intellectual Property Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762541.8 | 12.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP06794 | Priority number, date | DE20051035171 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005035171 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012399 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910151 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910151 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/06, B62D5/093 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B62D5/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE LENKUNG | [2008/16] | English: | ELECTROHYDRAULIC STEERING SYSTEM | [2008/16] | French: | DIRECTION HYDROELECTRIQUE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | PL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 06.10.2010 | |
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | SI | 06.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS61143263 ; | [XY]DE4031951 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [X] 1,5,13 * column 2, lines 38-61 - column 3, lines 45-53; figure 1 * [Y] 2,4; | [DA]DE10257130 (SAUER DANFOSS NORDBORG AS NORD [DK]) [DA] 1,2,4* the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861119), vol. 010, no. 342, Database accession no. (M - 536), & JP61143263 A 19860630 (KAYABA IND CO LTD) [Y] 2,4 * abstract * |