EP1922520 - EXHAUST GAS HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄMMLER, Georg Nobileweg 11b 70439 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
ROSIN, Jürgen Schulstrasse 19 73630 Remshalden / DE | [2008/21] | Application number, filing date | 06762691.1 | 19.07.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006EP07090 | Priority number, date | DE20051040612 | 27.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005040612 | [2008/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025610 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1922520 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922520 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28F21/06, F01N5/02 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
F28F19/04 (EP,US);
F28F21/06 (KR);
F01N5/02 (EP,KR,US);
F02M26/11 (EP,US);
F02M26/25 (EP,US);
F28D7/1684 (EP,US);
F28F1/003 (EP,US);
F28F13/18 (EP,US);
F28D21/0003 (EP,US);
F28F2250/06 (EP,US);
F28F2265/18 (EP,US);
F28F27/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASWÄRMEÜBERTRAGER | [2008/21] | English: | EXHAUST GAS HEAT EXCHANGER | [2008/21] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | IE | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | LT | 29.10.2008 | LV | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | PL | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | IS | 28.02.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | AT | 19.07.2009 | LU | 19.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LV | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
AT | 19.07.2009 | ||
LU | 19.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LV | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
AT | 19.07.2009 | ||
LU | 19.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LV | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
AT | 19.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LV | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 29.10.2008 | |
LT | 29.10.2008 | ||
LV | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 29.10.2008 | |
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19962863 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1* abstract * |