blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1922222

EP1922222 - OPERATOR CONTROL DEVICE FOR A DRIVER ASSISTANT SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2008/21]
Inventor(s)01 / MAYSER, Christoph
Fasanenstr. 137
82008 Unterhaching / DE
02 / NAAB, Karl
Unteranger 33
85457 Wörth / DE
 [2008/21]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2012/28]
Application number, filing date06762903.029.07.2006
[2008/21]
WO2006EP07531
Priority number, dateDE2005103692305.08.2005         Original published format: DE102005036923
[2008/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2007017148
Date:15.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1922222
Date:21.05.2008
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2008/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1922222
Date:11.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.2007
ClassificationIPC:B60K31/02
[2008/21]
CPC:
B60K31/042 (EP,US); B62D1/046 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/46]
Former [2008/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BEDIENEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2008/21]
English:OPERATOR CONTROL DEVICE FOR A DRIVER ASSISTANT SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE[2008/21]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2008/21]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2008National basic fee paid 
28.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
09.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2012Fee for grant paid
23.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2008
Opposition(s)12.04.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1129885  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-15 * figure 3 * [Y] 3,4;
 [Y]US2004020698  (GEHRKE HELMAR-STEFFEN [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4 * figure 3 *;
 [XY]US6282482  (HEDSTROEM LARS-GUNNAR [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 6, line 10 * * column 6, line 16 - line 22 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 7-15;
 [Y]US5477457  (OKADA MOTOHIRO [JP]) [Y] 7-9 * column 6, line 12 - line 19 * * figure 6 *;
 [Y]US6373400  (FUJITA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-14 * figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]US6260432  (EHRMAIER RUDOLF [DE], et al) [Y] 15 * column 5, line 26 - line 37 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]US2003184151  (MUELLER JAN-ERIK [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-8,12-14 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0021] * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US2003000763  (COLLING MORGAN [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,15 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * figures 3-9 *;
 [X]US5335743  (GILLBRAND PER [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,15 * column 9, line 24 - line 29 * * column 11, line 10 - line 15 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US2003209376  (KUSTOSCH MARIO [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5125485  (LANG ERNEST U [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 25 - line 27 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]DE10064307  (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6081763  (SMITH GRAEME PETER [GB], et al) [A] 10,11 * figures 2a-2d *;
 [A]US2002077216  (QUAST JOERG-RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 15 * abstract * * figure 1 *
ExaminationUS5088043
 DE19941947
 WO2004053661
 US5949149
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.