EP2052161 - PNEUMATIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norgren GmbH Bruckstrasse 93 46519 Alpen / DE | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIESEN, Norbert Utrechter Str. 19 47608 Geldern / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Hartwell, Ian Peter, et al Ollila Law Limited Warwick Innovation Centre Warwick Technology Park Gallows Hill Warwick CV34 6UW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Hartwell, Ian Peter, et al Ollila Law Limited Unit 5, The Courtyard, Wixford Park Bidford on Avon Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB | ||
Former [2011/19] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Law Limited First Floor Unit 5 The Courtyard Wixford Park Bidford on Avon Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB | ||
Former [2009/18] | Lanoe, Benjamin Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen, Warwickshire B95 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06762907.1 | 31.07.2006 | [2009/18] | WO2006EP07567 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008014799 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052161 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052161 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/032, B25B5/06 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
B25B5/061 (EP,US);
F15B11/0325 (EP,US);
F15B2211/216 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7053 (EP,US);
F15B2211/775 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHER STELLANTRIEB | [2009/18] | English: | PNEUMATIC ACTUATOR | [2009/18] | French: | ACTIONNEUR PNEUMATIQUE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2006 | AT | 07.11.2012 | BE | 07.11.2012 | CY | 07.11.2012 | DK | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | LT | 07.11.2012 | LV | 07.11.2012 | MC | 07.11.2012 | NL | 07.11.2012 | PL | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | SI | 07.11.2012 | SK | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | BG | 07.02.2013 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | IS | 07.03.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | IE | 31.07.2013 | LU | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 07.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2505553 (REUTI ANSTALT) [X] 1-38 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [X]DE19534380 (HILDE FRITZ MONTAGEBETRIEB [DE]) [X] 1-38 * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 13 *; | [X]JPS60256608 (ISOBE MASABUMI) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-16,18-24,26-29,31-36,38 * abstract *; | [X]JPS57179404 (ISOBE MASABUMI) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-16,18-24,26-29,31-36,38 * abstract * |