EP1927228 - MULTIPLE INTERFACE MOBILE NODE WITH SIMULTANEOUS HOME- AND FOREIGN NETWORK CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Jens Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4C 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
WENIGER, Kilian Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasser 4C 63225 Langen / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06762934.5 | 01.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006EP07611 | Priority number, date | EP20050020354 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05020354 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039007 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927228 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927228 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H04W8/04 (EP,US);
H04W60/005 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W80/02 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACH-SCHNITTSTELLEN-MOBILKNOTEN MIT GLEICHZEITIGER HEIMAT-UND FREMDNETZVERBINDUNG | [2008/23] | English: | MULTIPLE INTERFACE MOBILE NODE WITH SIMULTANEOUS HOME- AND FOREIGN NETWORK CONNECTION | [2008/23] | French: | NOEUD MOBILE A INTERFACES MULTIPLES ET A CONNEXION RESEAU DOMESTIQUE ET ETRANGER SIMULTANEE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010390.2 / EP2271159 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | LU | 01.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
LU | 01.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
LU | 01.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004107234 (RAJAHALME JARNO [FI]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2004109472 (CHOYI VINOD KUMAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0041] - [0050] *; | [A]US2004136337 (WARRIER CHANDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0018] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6804221 (MAGRET VINCENT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 7, line 45 - column 9, line 7 * * column 12, lines 40-50 *; | [A]US6892069 (FLYNN JASON STUART [GB]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 45 *; | [A] - NARTEN T ET AL, "Neighbor Discovery for IP version 6 (IPv6); draft-ietf-ipv6-2461bis-03.t", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200505), vol. ipv6, no. 3, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015041144 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004107234 | US2004109472 |