EP1877410 - MUTUAL PRODRUG COMPOUNDS FOR USE AS ANTIINFLAMMATORY AGENTS WITH GASTROINTESTINAL PROTECTIVE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nycomed GmbH Byk-Gulden-Strasse 2 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREHM, Christof Rheinaustr. 16 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KLEIN, Thomas Döbelestr. 16 78462 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
BUHR, Wilm Zum Kirchenwald 20 78465 Konstanz / DE | 04 /
CHIESA, Maria, Vittoria Alpenstrasse 5 78464 Konstanz / DE | 05 /
PALMER, Andreas Mägdebergstr. 2 78224 Singen / DE | 06 /
ZIMMERMANN, Peter, Jan Wilhelmstr 5 71139 Ehningen / DE | 07 /
SIMON, Wolfgang-Alexander Schubertstrasse 17 78464 Konstanz / DE | 08 /
POSTIUS, Stefan Austrasse 4b 78467 Konstanz / DE | 09 /
KROMER, Wolfgang Hinterhauserstr. 5 78464 Konstanz / DE | 10 /
GRUNDLER, Gerhard Meersburger Str. 4 78464 Konstanz / DE | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Mechnich, Oliver M.J., et al Takeda GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 78403 Konstanz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Mechnich, Oliver M.J., et al Nycomed GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 78406 Konstanz / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Mechnich, Oliver M.J., et al Nycomed GmbH Postfach 100310 78403 Konstanz / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Neels, Solvig, et al Nycomed GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 78403 Konstanz / DE | Application number, filing date | 06763060.8 | 26.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006EP61856 | Priority number, date | EP20050103585 | 29.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05103585 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117316 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1877410 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/14, C07D491/04, A61K31/00, A61P29/00, A61P1/04 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D471/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | 29.11.2007 | BA | 29.11.2007 | HR | 29.11.2007 | MK | 29.11.2007 | YU | 29.11.2007 | Title | German: | WECHSELSEITIGE PRODRUG-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE MITTEL MIT MAGEN-DARM-SCHUTZWIRKUNG | [2008/03] | English: | MUTUAL PRODRUG COMPOUNDS FOR USE AS ANTIINFLAMMATORY AGENTS WITH GASTROINTESTINAL PROTECTIVE ACTIVITY | [2008/03] | French: | COMPOSES DE PROMEDICAMENTS MUTUELS UTILISES COMME AGENTS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES A ACTIVITE GASTRO-INTESTINALE PROTECTRICE | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 05.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004071391 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [Y] - CHRISTIAANS J A M ET AL, "Cardiovascular hybrid drugs: combination of more than one pharmacological property in one single molecule", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0928-0987, pages 1 - 22, XP002279965 [Y] 1-11 * Parts 1, 2.2 and 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0928-0987(95)00029-1 |