EP1879871 - NEW HETEROCYCLYLETHYLAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience S.A. 16 rue Jean-Marie-Leclair 69009 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Darren Graf-Adolf-Strasse 7 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
COQUERON, Pierre-Yves 56 Cours De La Liberté F-69003 Lyon / FR | 03 /
RIECK, Heiko 29 Allée Buffon F-69110 Sainte Foy-les-Lyon / FR | 04 /
DESBORDES, Philippes 30 Rue Bancel F-69007 Lyon / FR | 05 /
VILLIER, Alain Les Terres de Tourvéon Bat. A, 2 Chemin Du Champ F-69660 Collonges au Mont d'Or / FR | 06 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge Route d'Albigny F-69250 Curis au Mont d'Or / FR | 07 /
GENIX, Pierre 10 Rue Janin F-69004 Lyon / FR | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Darren Graf-Adolf-Strasse 7 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
COQUERON, Pierre-Yves 56 Cours De La Liberté F-69003 Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
RIECK, Heiko 29 Allée Buffon F-69110 Sainte Foy-les-Lyon / FR | |||
04 /
DESBORDES, Philippes 30 Rue Bancel F-69007 Lyon / FR | |||
05 /
VILLIER, Alain Les Terres de Tourvéon Bat. A, 2 Chemin Du Champ F-69660 Collonges au Mont d'Or / FR | |||
06 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge Route d'Albigny F-69250 Curis au Mont d'Or / FR | |||
07 /
GENIX, Pierre 14 Rue Duviard F-69004 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Nowak, Alexander, et al Bayer CropScience AG Business Planning and Administration Law and Patents Patents and Licensing, Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Nowak, Alexander, et al Bayer CropScience AG Business Planning and Administration Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Gerhards, Frank Bayer CropScience SA Patents & Licensing Dept. 14-20 Rue Pierre Baizet BP 9163 69263 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 06763073.1 | 02.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006EP61954 | Priority number, date | EP20050356076 | 03.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05356076 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117358 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879871 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/30, A01N43/54 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
C07D239/30 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE HETEROCYCLYLETHYLAMID-DERIVATE | [2008/04] | English: | NEW HETEROCYCLYLETHYLAMIDE DERIVATIVES | [2008/04] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES D'HETEROCYCLYLETHYLAMIDE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9429336 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * examples 72,73,81 *; | [A]US3573306 (SHEPARD KENNETH L, et al) [A] 1-10 * compounds 33, 58-61; column 13, lines 69-74 *; | [A]WO0111965 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * Formulae Ip, Iq;; paragraph [0037]; tables C,D * | [A] - REINHARD SARGES, DONALD E. KUHLA, HANS E. WIEDERMANN, DALE A. MAYHEW, "Sulfamylurea Hypoglycemic Agents. 6. High-Potency Derivatives", J. MED. CHEM., (1976), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 695 - 709, XP000567727 [A] 1-10 * table VII * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00227a023 |