EP1885391 - USE OF GLP-2 FOR THE TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIA-REPERFUSION INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé P.O. Box 3000 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé P.O. Box 3000 DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, Uffe, Bang Horsbred 111 DK-2625 Vallensbæk / DK | [2008/07] | Application number, filing date | 06763195.2 | 19.05.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006EP62457 | Priority number, date | EP20050104280 | 19.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05104280 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006122981 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1885391 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,US);
A61P9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON GLP-2 ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ISCHÄMIE-REPERFUSIONSSCHÄDEN | [2008/07] | English: | USE OF GLP-2 FOR THE TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIA-REPERFUSION INJURY | [2008/07] | French: | UTILISATION DE GLP-2 POUR LE TRAITEMENT D UNE BLESSURE D ISCHEMIE-REPERFUSION | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - RAJEEVPRASAD R ET AL, "Glucagonlike peptide-2 analogue enhances intestinal mucosal mass and absorptive function after ischemia-reperfusion injury.", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC SURGERY. NOV 2000, (200011), vol. 35, no. 11, ISSN 0022-3468, pages 1537 - 1539, XP002350147 [X] 1-4,8,9,11 * page 571, column L, paragraph 2; figures 1,2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/jpsu.2000.18301 | [X] - PRASAD R ET AL, "GLP-2alpha accelerates recovery of mucosal absorptive function after intestinal ischemia/reperfusion.", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC SURGERY. APR 2001, (200104), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3468, pages 570 - 572, XP002350148 [X] 1-4,8,9,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/jpsu.2001.22284 | [X] - GUAN LILI ET AL, "Uncoupling protein 2 involved in protection of Glucagon-like peptide 2 in small intestine with ischemia-reperfusion injury in mice", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (200503), vol. 50, no. 3, ISSN 0163-2116, pages 554 - 560, XP002350149 [X] 1-12 * page 555, column L, paragraph 4 * * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10620-005-2474-3 |