EP1896026 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING TIOTROPIUM SALTS, TIOTROPIUM SALTS AS SUCH AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POP, Mihaela Le Tourmalet 14 NL-1060 NX, Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
MULDER, HOUDAYER, Stéphanie Fazantenkamp 413 NL-3607 XD Maarssen / NL | 03 /
SIEGER, Peter Klingenäcker 7 88441 Mittelbiberach / DE | 04 /
PIEPER, Michael, P. Baind 12 88400 Biberach / DE | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/11] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06763345.3 | 30.05.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006EP62688 | Priority number, date | EP20050105270 | 15.06.2005 Original published format: EP 05105270 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006134021 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1896026 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1896026 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/46, A61P11/00, C07D451/10 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
C07D451/00 (EP,US);
C07D451/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/46 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIOTROPIUM SALZEN, TIOTROPIUM SALZE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE MISCHUNGEN | [2013/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING TIOTROPIUM SALTS, TIOTROPIUM SALTS AS SUCH AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF | [2008/11] | French: | PROCEDÉ DE FABRICATION DES SELS DE TIOTROPIUM, DES SELS DE TIOTROPIUM ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2013/20] |
Former [2008/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIOTROPIUMSALZEN, TIOTROPIUMSALZE ALS SOLCHE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DARAUS | ||
Former [2008/11] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DES SELS DE TIOTROPIUM, DES SELS DE TIOTROPIUM ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2006 | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | IE | 30.05.2014 | LU | 30.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.05.2006 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.05.2014 | ||
LU | 30.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.05.2014 | ||
LU | 30.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.05.2014 | ||
LU | 30.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.05.2014 | ||
LU | 30.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 30.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 30.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 30.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0230928 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 26 *; | [Y]WO03057694 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10,13,14,67-74 * page 8, line 18 - line 27 * * page 3, line 18 *; | [Y]WO2004064789 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US], et al) [Y] 11-74 * page 23, line 31 - page 24, line 7; claims 2,4-6 *; | [YX]US2005096341 (BANHOLZER ROLF [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10,22-32,41-64 * paragraph [0001]; claim 5 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026]; examples 3,4; claim - * * paragraph [0073] * [X] 11-14,66-74; | [YD]WO2005042526 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [YD] 11-14,22-32,41-74 * page 9, line 10 - line 17; claims 5,6 *; | [Y] - BERGE S M ET AL, "PHARMACEUTICALS SALTS", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION. WASHINGTON, US, (1977), vol. 66, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1 - 19, XP000562636 [Y] 11-74 * page 1, paragraph L; table 1 * * page 2, column R, paragraph L * * page 5, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 16, column L, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 |