EP1899330 - SUBSTITUTED GLYCINAMIDES HAVING AN ANTITHROMBOTIC AND FACTOR XA-INHIBITING EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Correction of patent specification | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIENEN, Wolfgang Kirschenweg 27 88400 Biberach / DE | 02 /
PFAU, Roland Pfluggasse 15 88400 Biberach / DE | 03 /
GERLACH, Kai Mondstrasse 18/1 88400 Biberach / DE | 04 /
DAHMANN, Georg Bahnhofstrasse 14 88448 Attenweiler / DE | 05 /
PRIEPKE, Henning Birkenharderstr. 11 88447 Warthausen / DE | 06 /
NAR, Herbert Hexenweg 19 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | 07 /
HANDSCHUH, Sandra Beim Fohrhaeldele 16 88400 Biberach / DE | 08 /
SCHULER-METZ, Annette Holzgasse 7 89081 Ulm / DE | [2010/47] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
WIENEN, Wolfgang Kirschener 27 88400 Biberach / DE | ||
02 /
PFAU, Roland Pfluggasse 15 88400 Biberach / DE | |||
03 /
GERLACH, Kai Mondstrasse 18/1 88400 Biberach / DE | |||
04 /
DAHMANN, Georg Bahnhofstrasse 14 88448 Attenweiler / DE | |||
05 /
PRIEPKE, Henning Birkenharderstr. 11 88447 Warthausen / DE | |||
06 /
NAR, Herbert Hexenweg 19 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | |||
07 /
HANDSCHUH, Sandra Beim Fohrhaeldele 16 88400 Biberach / DE | |||
08 /
SCHULER-METZ, Annette Holzgasse 7 89081 Ulm / DE | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06763910.4 | 28.06.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006EP63611 | Priority number, date | EP20050014270 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: EP 05014270 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003536 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899330 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899330 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1899330 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/14, C07D409/12, C07D487/04, C07D413/04, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, A61K31/55, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P9/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,NO,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,NO,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,NO,US);
A61K31/55 (KR,NO);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D413/04 (KR);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | RS | 30.01.2008 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE GLYCINAMIDE MIT ANTITHROMBOTISCHER UND FAKTOR XA-INHIBIERENDER WIRKUNG | [2008/12] | English: | SUBSTITUTED GLYCINAMIDES HAVING AN ANTITHROMBOTIC AND FACTOR XA-INHIBITING EFFECT | [2008/12] | French: | GLYCINAMIDES SUBSTITUES A EFFET ANTITHROMBOTIQUE ET INHIBANT LE FACTEUR XA | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 24.03.2011 | [2011/23] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0147919 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004046138 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |