EP1890854 - METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF WOOD OR WOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknocomp OY Puusepänkuja 71910 Alapitkä / FI | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOTTINEN, Ari Mäkikyläntie 807 FI-71920 Pajujärvi / FI | 02 /
HOTTINEN, Pekka Jokeripolku 6 FI-71910 Alapitkä / FI | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Laine, Terho Tapio, et al Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Ayritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Laine, Terho Tapio, et al Oy Heinänen Patent Agency Annankatu 31-33 C 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06764424.5 | 14.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006FI00198 | Priority number, date | FI20050000649 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: FI 20050649 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006134210 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890854 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B27M1/02, B27M1/08, B30B7/02, B30B15/06, F26B9/04, F26B3/04 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
F26B7/00 (EP,US);
B27M1/02 (EP,FI,US);
B27M1/08 (FI);
B30B15/06 (FI);
B30B7/02 (FI);
F26B21/06 (EP,US);
F26B23/02 (EP,US);
F26B25/185 (EP,US);
F26B3/04 (FI);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HOLZ ODER HOLZPRODUKTEN | [2008/09] | English: | METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF WOOD OR WOOD PRODUCTS | [2008/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ AU TRAITEMENT DU BOIS OU DE PRODUITS DU BOIS | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH626981 (KLEINGUENTHER ROBERT [US]); | [DX]WO2005049291 (TEKNOCOMP OY [FI], et al) | International search | [A]DE19951627 (WOLF SYSTEMBAU GMBH & CO KG [AT]); | [A]US2004025367 (HOTTINEN ARI [FI], et al); | [X]FI20031697 (TEKNOCOMP OY [FI]) |