EP1877259 - MECHANICAL DEVICE FOR REMOVABLY FIXING A SLEEVE TO A SUPPORT SHAFT OF A PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOMORI-CHAMBON SA 6, rue Auguste Rodin 45060 Orléans / FR | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Pierre 42, rue Alexandre Dumas F-45100 Orléans / FR | 02 /
SIX, Bernard 144, rue des Vanneaux F-45160 Olivet / FR | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Puiroux, Guy, et al Jurispatent Cabinet Claude Guiu 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Puiroux, Guy, et al Jurispatent Cabinet Claude Guiu 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | ||
Former [2008/17] | Puiroux, Guy, et al Jurispatent Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/03] | Gauer, Pierre Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, Rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06764576.2 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006FR00972 | Priority number, date | FR20050004322 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0504322 | [2008/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006114534 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1877259 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/10 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B41F27/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORÜBERGEHENDEN BEFESTIGUNG EINER FOLIE AN EINEM STÜTZSCHAFT EINER DRUCKMASCHINE | [2008/03] | English: | MECHANICAL DEVICE FOR REMOVABLY FIXING A SLEEVE TO A SUPPORT SHAFT OF A PRINTING MACHINE | [2008/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF MECANIQUE DE FIXATION AMOVIBLE D'UN MANCHON SUR UN ARBRE PORTEUR D'UNE MACHINE A IMPRIMER | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US4142690 (KARLE HERBERT, et al) [I] 1,3,5-7,9-11 * column 3, lines 35-49; figure 1 * * column 4, lines 5-15; figure 2 * [A] 9; | [IA]US3833179 (MAURER R) [I] 1,3,5,8 * column 3, lines 1-30; figures 1,3 * [A] 13; | [IA]US4492346 (YOUNG LAWRENCE C [US]) [I] 1,3,9 * figures 2,3 * [A] 13; | [IA]US3593934 (CONRAD PETER, et al) [I] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 13; | [I]US3462092 (MULLINS DAVID M) [I] 1,8 * column 1, lines 42-66 *; | [I]US3092342 (ULYSSES JACKSON IVAN) [I] 1,9 * figure 3 *; | [A]US3448937 (BECK ALVIN F) [A] 1,3,9,10,13 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2742379 |