EP1907834 - APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A MOVEABLE APPARATUS ON A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Newcastle upon Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle Upon Tyne, NE1 7RU / GB | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSKILLY, Anthony Paul 14 Linden Acres Longhorsley Northumberland NE65 8XQ / GB | 02 /
HESLOP, Jonathan 1 Ada Street Walker Newcastle Upon Tyne NE6 2RB / GB | 03 /
TUNWATTANA, Noppadon 71B Durham Road Gateshead NE8 4AP / GB | [2019/24] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
ROSKILLY, Anthony Paul 14 Linden Acres Longhorsley Northumberland NE65 8XQ / GB | ||
02 /
HESLOP, Jonathan 1 Ada Street Walker Newcastle upon Tyne NE6 2RB / GB | |||
03 /
TUNWATTANA, Noppadon 71B Durham Road Gateshead NE8 4AP / GB | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [2019/24] |
Former [2008/15] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06765043.2 | 20.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006GB02713 | Priority number, date | GB20050015031 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0515031 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010265 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907834 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907834 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G01S17/875 (EP,US);
B63B59/10 (EP);
G01C21/3811 (EP,US);
G01C21/3841 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP);
G05D1/0253 (EP);
G05D1/0259 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | G01N27/87, G01C21/12, B63B59/10, G06T1/00, G01S17/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER LAGE EINER BEWEGLICHEN VORRICHTUNG AUF EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2008/15] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A MOVEABLE APPARATUS ON A SURFACE | [2008/15] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA POSITION D'UN APPAREIL MOBILE SUR UNE SURFACE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12168963.2 / EP2497708 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2006 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | IE | 20.07.2019 | LU | 20.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | FR | 12.08.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | GB | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | IS | 12.11.2019 | DE | 01.02.2020 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3506638 (GOTTFELD F H WERKSTOFFPRUEFUNG [DE]) [Y] 18,19 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4671650 (HIRZEL EDGAR A [US], et al) [X] 30,38 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-29 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 26 * * column 6, lines 35-57 * * column 7, lines 64-67 * * column 15, line 46 - column 16, line 16 * [A] 31-37,39-41; | [XA]USH1409H (BIXLER ROBERT A [US]) [X] 30,38 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 20 * * column 6, lines 36-48 * * column 7, lines 13-18 * [A] 31-37,39-41; | [A]US6038280 (ROESSIGER VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 30,38 * abstract * * column 1, lines 34-32 * * column 2, lines 7-44 ** column 4, lines 42-53 *; | [A]US6317387 (D AMADDIO EUGENE R [US], et al) [A] 1-19,21-28 * column 1, lines 8-22 * * column 2, lines 47-50 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 21 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 26 *; | [XYA]WO02086474 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1,5,6,21,23 * the whole document * [Y] 18,19 [A] 2-4,7-17,22,24-28; | [XDA]US2005015209 (WUEBKER STEFAN [DE]) [XD] 1,5,6,21,23 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,7-19,22,24-28,30-41; | [A]FR2861457 (BRUSSIEUX MARC SERGE [FR]) [A] 1-19,21-28 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph LAST - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph LAST - page 6, line 20 * |