EP1919783 - A CONTAINER FOR FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colpac Limited Enterprise Way, Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDMAN, Neil Enterprise Way Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | 02 /
MILLS, Frank Enterprise Way Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | 03 /
WRIGHT, Philip Enterprise Way Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | [2015/49] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
GOLDMAN, Neil Enterprise Way Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | ||
02 /
MILLS, Frank Enterprise Way Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | |||
03 /
WRIGHT, Philip Enterprise Way Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | |||
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
GOLDMAN, Neil Enterprise Way, Maulden Road Flitwick, Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | ||
02 /
MILLS, Frank Enterprise Way, Maulden Road Flitwick, Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | |||
03 /
WRIGHT, Philip Enterprise Way, Maulden Road Flitwick, Bedfordshire MK45 5BW / GB | Representative(s) | Gill, Ian Stephen, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Gill, Ian Stephen, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2008/20] | Gill, Ian Stephen, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06765165.3 | 28.07.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006GB02850 | Priority number, date | GB20050015677 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0515677 | GB20060004490 | 06.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0604490 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012880 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1919783 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1919783 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1919783 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/36 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
B65D5/3607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTELBEHÄLTER | [2015/17] | English: | A CONTAINER FOR FOOD | [2008/20] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR ALIMENTS | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/20] | BEHÄLTER FÜR LEBENSMITTEL | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Coveris Flexibles (St Neots) UK Limited Howard Road Eaton Socon St Neots Cambridgeshire PE 19 8ET / GB Opponent's representative Lipscombe, Martin John, et al, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | 02
09.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Coveris Flexibles UK Limited Enterprise Way Pinchbeck Spalding Lincolnshire PE11 3YR / GB Opponent's representative Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Coveris Flexibles (St Neots) UK Limited Howard Road Eaton Socon St Neots Cambridgeshire PE 19 8ET / GB Opponent's representative Lipscombe, Martin John, et al, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
02
09.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Coveris Flexibles UK Limited Enterprise Way Pinchbeck Spalding Lincolnshire PE11 3YR / GB Opponent's representative Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London Greater London SE1 2AU / GB | |||
Former [2015/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE St Neots Packaging Limited Howard Road Eaton Socon St Neots, Cambridgeshire PE 19 8ET / GB Opponent's representative Lipscombe, Martin John, et al, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
02
09.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Coveris Flexibles UK Limited Enterprise Way Pinchbeck Spalding Lincolnshire PE11 3YR / GB Opponent's representative Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London Greater London SE1 2AU / GB | |||
Former [2012/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE St Neots Packaging Limited Howard Road Eaton Socon St Neots, Cambridgeshire PE 19 8ET / GB Opponent's representative Lipscombe, Martin John, et al, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
02
09.12.2011
14.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE Paragon Labels Limited Enterprise Way Pinchbeck Spalding Lincolnshire PE211 3YR / GB Opponent's representative Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | 13.01.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.07.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.03.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.10.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2011 | BE | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | IT | 09.03.2011 | LT | 09.03.2011 | LV | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | LU | 28.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2018/17] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 28.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 28.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.03.2011 | |
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2321236 (COLPAC LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 1,3 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]DE29903316U (FRIEDRICH FREUND GMBH KARTONAG [DE]) [Y] 1,3* page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 31; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]GB2398557 (ROKOV DAVID [GB]) [X] 1,2,8-12,15 * page 4, line 26 - page 8, line 8; figures 2,3 * [A] 4-7,13,14,16-20 | Opposition | US5522538 | US2349589 |