EP1915164 - THE USE OF CHARCOAL FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LIMITED Electrical and Electronic Engineering Building. Imperial College London Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | For all designated states The Feinstein Institute for Medical Research 350 Community Drive Manhasset, NY 11030 / US | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOXWELL, Brian M., Kennedy Inst. of Rheumatolgy Div. Imperial College, 1 Aspenlea Road Hammersmith, London W6 8LH / GB | 02 /
SUMARIWALLA, Percy, Kennedy Inst. of Rheumatolgy Div. Imperial College, 1 Aspenlea Road Hammersmith, London W6 8LH / GB | 03 /
KAYE, Paul, University of York Department of Biology, Immunology & Infection Unit York YO10 5YW / GB | 04 /
TRACEY, Kevin, The Fenstein Inst. for Med. Res. Lab. of Biomedical Science..., 350 Community Drive Mahasset, NY 11030 / US | 05 /
KENIGSBERG, Kenneth, The Fenstein Inst. for Med.Res Lab. of Biomedical Science..., 350 Community Drive Mahasset, NY 11030 / US | 06 /
ULLOA, Luis, The Fenstein Inst. for Med. Res. Center of Immunol. & Inflam., 350 Community Drive Mahasset, NY 11030 / US | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06765212.3 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006GB02908 | Priority number, date | GB20050016069 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: GB 0516069 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007015102 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915164 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/44, A61P29/02 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
A61K33/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON KOHLE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2008/18] | English: | THE USE OF CHARCOAL FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY CONDITIONS | [2008/18] | French: | UTILISATION DE CHARBON POUR LE TRAITEMENT D AFFECTIONS INFLAMMATOIRES | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 22.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0688568 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,13,14,17-19 * column 2, paragraph 2 * * column 9; example 2 * * claim 1 * [Y] 4,5,7-12; | [XY]EP0688566 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,13,14,17-19 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 12 * * column 9; example 2 * * claim 1 * [Y] 4,5,7-12; | [XY]US2003003095 (SUNBERG RICHARD JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13,14,17-19 * page 1, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 1, column R, paragraph 9 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 4, column L, paragraphs 2,4 * * page 4, column R, paragraph 7 * [Y] 4,5,7-12; | [X]CN1557386 (LIU LIN [CN]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XP]CN1660350 (YAN BIN [CN]) [XP] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2006134096 (PETRIK VIKTOR I [RU]) [XP] 1-3,6,13,14,17-19 * page 1, column R, paragraphs 2,4 ** claims 1-20 *; | [XY] - JANSEN MARC ET AL, "Influence of intraperitoneal therapy with mitomycin C adsorbed on activated carbon on anastomotic and wound healing in rats", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (200209), vol. 47, no. 9, ISSN 0163-2116, pages 1992 - 1997, XP002408308 [X] 7-12 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019604308494 | [XY] - NATSUGOE SHOJI ET AL, "Loco-regional treatment for esophageal cancer with bleomycin adsorbed to activated carbon particles", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 13, no. 5C, ISSN 0250-7005, pages 1785 - 1787, XP009075041 [X] 7-12 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,13-19 | [Y] - SEDGHI S ET AL, "Charcoal enema attenuates colonic inflammation induced in rats by acetic acid (HOAc): Possible pathogenic role of lumenal factors in ulcerative colitis (UC)", GASTROENTEROLOGY, & 95TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN GASTROENTEROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION; NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA; MAY 15-18, 1994, (1994), vol. 106, no. 4 SUPPL., ISSN 0016-5085, page A771, XP009075040 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * |