EP1890748 - METHOD OF IDENTIFYING A PLURALITY OF CONTAINERS AND/OR FINISHED ARTICLES OBTAINED FROM THE SAID CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson France Rue Aristide Bergès 38800 Le Pont-de-Claix / FR | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMARD, Jean-Pierre 14, rue du Nord F-38450 Vif / FR | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Brédeville, Odile Marie, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2020/22] |
Former [2008/09] | Brédeville, Odile Marie, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06765593.6 | 26.04.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006IB01733 | Priority number, date | FR20050004306 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0504306 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006123252 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890748 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890748 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31, B41M5/24, B41M5/26, A61J1/00, B29C71/00, C03B19/14 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C03C23/0025 (EP,US);
A61J1/05 (KR);
A61J1/00 (EP,US);
A61J1/06 (KR);
A61M5/28 (KR);
A61M5/30 (KR);
A61M5/3129 (EP,US);
A61J2205/10 (EP,US);
A61J2205/30 (EP,US);
A61J2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6063 (EP,US);
B41M5/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER MEHRZAHL VON BEHÄLTERN UND/ODER VON AUS DIESEN BEHÄLTERN HERGESTELLTEN FERTIGTEILEN | [2019/51] | English: | METHOD OF IDENTIFYING A PLURALITY OF CONTAINERS AND/OR FINISHED ARTICLES OBTAINED FROM THE SAID CONTAINERS | [2008/09] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION D'UNE PLURALITE DE RECIPIENTS ET/OU D'ARTICLES FINIS CONTENUS DANS LESDITS RECIPIENTS | [2008/09] |
Former [2008/09] | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION MEHRERER BEHÄLTER UND/ODER AUS DIESEN BEHÄLTERN GEWONNENER FERTIGARTIKEL | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2006 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 26.04.2006 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2690862 (ARES SA [FR]) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5647854 (OLSEN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 2* column 1, lines 49-65 *; | [Y]GB2324985 (UNITED DISTILLERS PLC [GB]) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2001028390 (HAYASHI KENICHI [JP]) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6519569 (WHITE GALE [US], et al) [Y] 10 * column 6, lines 23-38; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US6638440 (GRIMARD JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004186437 (FRENETTE CLAUDE E [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2004084795 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * page 17, line 10 - page 19, line 11; figures 1a-1f * * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 3 * [Y] 5,7,9,10 |