EP1882400 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR ENABLING DIMMING USING TRIAC DIMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN MEURS, Jos C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/05] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06765671.0 | 08.05.2006 | [2008/05] | WO2006IB51429 | Priority number, date | EP20050103823 | 09.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05103823 | [2008/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006120629 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1882400 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/392, H02M5/257, H05B41/285 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
H05B41/2853 (EP,US);
H05B41/3924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNG ZUR AKTIVIERUNG EINER DÄMPFUNG ÜBER EINEN TRIAC-DIMMER | [2008/05] | English: | METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR ENABLING DIMMING USING TRIAC DIMMER | [2008/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT PERMETTANT UNE GRADATION DE L'INTENSITE LUMINEUSE AU MOYEN D'UN GRADATEUR TRIAC | [2008/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1467474 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 3,4a *; | [XP]WO2005115058 (POLYBRITE INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] * * figures 1,5,6,8 * | by applicant | EP1467474 |