EP1897056 - COMBINED EXCHANGE OF IMAGE AND RELATED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/32] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JONG, Pieter, W., T. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
THEUNE, Patric c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DER POT, Mauritius, H., J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
WOUTERS, Johannes, H., P. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/32] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/11] | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06765780.9 | 19.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006IB51960 | Priority number, date | EP20050105616 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: EP 05105616 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006137000 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1897056 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1897056 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G06T15/00, G06T17/00 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N2213/003 (EP,US);
H04N2213/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTER AUSTAUSCH VON BILDERN UND ZUGEHÖRIGEN DATEN | [2008/11] | English: | COMBINED EXCHANGE OF IMAGE AND RELATED DATA | [2008/11] | French: | ÉCHANGE COMBINÉ DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE ET DE DONNÉES APPARENTÉES | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2015 | 10.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2006 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.06.2006 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6362822 (RANDEL MARK R [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, lines 6-38 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 3 *; | [A]US2003058238 (DOAK DAVID GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0101] , [0190] , [0215] * | Examination | US2002071616 | US2003198290 | EP1501317 | - NIKOS GRAMMALIDIS ET AL, "Disparity and Occlusion Estimation in Multiocular Systems and Their Coding for the Communication of Multiview Image Sequences", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19980601), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 1051-8215, XP011014467 |