EP1901696 - LIQUID FOUNDATION, A MAKE-UP METHOD, AND A KIT FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEVENET, Ludovic 128 Avenue Du Général Leclerc F-92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Tanty, François, et al Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/13] | Leszczynski, André, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06765994.6 | 04.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006IB52239 | Priority number, date | FR20050052121 | 08.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0552121 | US20050704425P | 02.08.2005 Original published format: US 704425 P | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007007231 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1901696 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/0245 (US);
A61K8/0262 (US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K2800/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE GRUNDIERUNG, MAKE-UP METHODE UND KIT ZUR UMSETZUNG DIESER METHODE | [2008/13] | English: | LIQUID FOUNDATION, A MAKE-UP METHOD, AND A KIT FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD | [2008/13] | French: | FOND LIQUIDE, PROCEDE DE MAQUILLAGE ET KIT POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2006037900 (OREAL [FR], et al) [PX] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2006054002 (OREAL [FR], et al) [PX] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2006037903 (OREAL [FR], et al) [PX] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2006037906 (OREAL [FR], et al) [PX] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP1510502 (TITAN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [X] 1,7-15,23-26 * paragraph [0031]; claim - * [Y] 1-6,16-20; | [X]JPH07324015 ; | [X]JPH04198117 ; | [X]JPH01242513 ; | [Y]US5127952 (PERSELLO JACQUES [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6,16-20 * column 9, lines 1,2; claim - *; | [A]WO2004000244 (DEAD SEA LAB LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US6033655 (LAHANAS KONSTANTINOS M [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]WO02053114 (GIOVANNI COSMETICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07324015 A 19951212 (NOK CORP) [X] 1,7-15,23-26 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921029), vol. 016, no. 528, Database accession no. (C - 1001), & JP04198117 A 19920717 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP; others: 01) [X] 1,7-15,23-26 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891220), vol. 013, no. 579, Database accession no. (C - 668), & JP01242513 A 19890927 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 1,7-15,23-26 * abstract * |