EP1906455 - SOLAR CELL ELEMENT AND SOLAR CELL ELEMENT MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUI, Kenji, KYOCERA CORPORATION 11, 66-6, Nagatanino, Hebimizo-cho Higashiohmi-shi, Shiga 527-8555 / JP | [2012/09] |
Former [2008/14] | 01 /
FUKUI, Kenji, KYOCERA CORPORATION 11, 66-6, Nagatanino, Hebimizo-cho Higashiohmi-shi, Shiga 527-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06766765.9 | 15.06.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006JP312031 | Priority number, date | JP20050181538 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005181538 | JP20050283687 | 29.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005283687 | [2008/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006137322 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1906455 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906455 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/04, H01L31/0216 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/02167 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/30] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SOLARZELLENELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLARZELLENELEMENTS | [2008/14] | English: | SOLAR CELL ELEMENT AND SOLAR CELL ELEMENT MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2008/14] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PILE SOLAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2008 | Translation filed | 17.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 23.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5932179 (HOKUSAN KK) [A] 1,3,6,11 * abstract *; | [A]JPH05129640 (SHARP KK) [A] 1,3,6,11 * abstract *; | [XI]US5320684 (AMICK JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9,11 * abstract * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 8 * * column 13, line 19 - line 68 * * column 14, line 13 - line 26 * * column 14, line 41 - line 56 * [I] 2,4,5,10; | [A]US5766964 (ROHATGI AJEET [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,11* abstract * |