EP1898400 - OPTICAL DISK UNIT AND DRIVING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Katsuya Matsushita Electr.Industr. 19F Matsushita IMP bldg,3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Rie Matsushita Electr.Industr. 19F Matsushita IMP bldg,3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
KISHIMOTO, Takashi Matsushita Electr.Industr. 19F Matsushita IMP bldg,3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
ISHIBASHI, Hiroshige Matsushita Electr.Industr. 19F Matsushita IMP bldg,3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06766819.4 | 16.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006JP312131 | Priority number, date | JP20050191574 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005191574 | [2008/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007004406 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898400 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1898400 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/004, G11B19/12 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G11B19/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US);
G11B7/1275 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/31] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE PLATTENEINHEIT UND ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/11] | English: | OPTICAL DISK UNIT AND DRIVING METHOD THEREFOR | [2008/11] | French: | UNITÉ DE DISQUE OPTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2007 | Translation filed | 06.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 31.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYA]US2004224041 (MORISHIMA MORITO [JP]) [X] 1-4,12-16 * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0137] * [Y] 2 [A] 5,15; | [Y]JP2004273037 (SONY CORP) [Y] 2 * abstract * |