EP1982736 - WATER FOR PREPARING DIALYSATE AND DIALYSATE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING DIALYSATE USING THE SAME, AND DIALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Trim Co., Ltd. 1-8-34, Oyodonaka, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5310076 / JP | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KABAYAMA, Shigeru NIHON TRIM CO., LTD. 1-8-34, Oyodonaka, Kitaku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-0076 / JP | 02 /
MORISAWA, Shinkatsu NIHON TRIM CO., LTD. 1-8-34, Oyodonaka, Kitaku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-0076 / JP | [2015/47] |
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
KABAYAMA, Shigeru NIHON TRIM CO., LTD. 1-8-34, Oyodonaka, Kitaku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-0076 / JP | ||
02 /
MORISAWA, Shinkatsu NIHON TRIM CO., LTD. 1-8-34, Oyodonaka, Kitaku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-0076 / JP | Representative(s) | Willett, Christopher David, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Willett, Christopher David, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | Willett, Christopher David, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06766889.7 | 19.06.2006 | [2008/43] | WO2006JP312225 | Priority number, date | JP20060118165 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006118165 | [2008/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122740 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982736 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1982736 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/16, A61K45/06, A61K31/7004, A61K33/00, B01D61/02, C02F1/00, C02F1/28, C02F1/44, C02F9/00, C02F1/461, C02F103/02 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
A61M1/1656 (EP,US);
C02F1/4693 (KR);
A61K31/7004 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61M1/14 (KR);
A61M1/1666 (EP,US);
B01D61/02 (KR);
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
C02F1/445 (KR);
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F2001/4619 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7004, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/43] | A61M1/14, B01D61/02, C02F1/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/47] |
Former [2009/26] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WASSER ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DIALYSATS UND DIALYSAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES DIALYSATS DAMIT UND DIALYSEGERÄT | [2008/43] | English: | WATER FOR PREPARING DIALYSATE AND DIALYSATE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING DIALYSATE USING THE SAME, AND DIALYZER | [2008/43] | French: | EAU SERVANT À PRÉPARER UN DIALYSAT ET DIALYSAT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DIALYSAT UTILISANT CELLE-CI ET DIALYSEUR | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2008 | Translation filed | 06.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 22.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 07.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2406476 (NIHON TRIM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 9, lines 3-22 *; | [IY]EP0826636 (NIHON TRIM CO LIMITED [JP]) [I] 1 * table 1 * * page 4, lines 13-17 * * claim 8 * [Y] 2,5; | [A]WO2004014355 (TALGON INVEST LTD [GB], et al) [A] 2 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]US2005020507 (ZIESKE PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 2,5 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0026] , [0044] , [0045] *; | [A]WO2006019855 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [A] 2,5 * page 3, lines 27-29 * * page 4, lines 13-32 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 12 *; | [YA] - SUHAIL AHMAD, "Essentials of water treatment in hemodialysis", HEMODIALYSIS INTERNATIONAL, (20050401), vol. 9, pages 127 - 134, XP002717643 [Y] 2,5 * the whole document * [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1492-7535.2005.01124.x |