EP1896701 - ENGINE OIL LEVEL DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINOGI, Yoshihisa c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
FUKUSHIMA, Tomoki c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
TOIDA, Naoya c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
SHINODA, Akihisa c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
MAEDA, Takeshi c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
SHINOGI, Yoshihisa c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
FUKUSHIMA, Tomoki c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
TOIDA, Naoya c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
SHINODA, Akihisa c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
MAEDA, Takeshi c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06767215.4 | 16.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006JP312565 | Priority number, date | JP20050182840 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005182840 | JP20050182872 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005182872 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006137507 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1896701 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1896701 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/12, G01F23/00 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G01F23/70 (EP,US);
F01M11/12 (EP,KR,US);
G01F23/00 (KR);
G01F23/80 (EP,US);
H01H35/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/40] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERFASSUNG DES MOTORÖLFÜLLSTANDS | [2008/11] | English: | ENGINE OIL LEVEL DETECTION SYSTEM | [2008/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE NIVEAU D'HUILE DE MOTEUR | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |