EP1900321 - NEEDLE INTEGRATING BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Hideaki, NAT. INST. OF ADV. INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE.& TECH., Tsukuba Central 4, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8562 / JP | 02 /
GOTOH, Masao, NAT. INST. OF ADV. INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE.& TECH., Tsukuba Central 4, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8562 / JP | 03 /
KARUBE, Isao, NAT. INST. OF ADV. INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE.& TECH., Tsukuba Central 4, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8562 / JP | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2008/12] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06767435.8 | 27.06.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006JP312818 | Priority number, date | JP20050185988 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005185988 | JP20050201072 | 11.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005201072 | JP20050218685 | 28.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005218685 | [2008/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007001001 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900321 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A61B10/0045 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150099 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150435 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150572 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/1519 (EP,US);
A61B5/15194 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/31] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NADELINTEGRIERENDER BIOSENSOR | [2008/12] | English: | NEEDLE INTEGRATING BIOSENSOR | [2008/12] | French: | AIGUILLE A BIOCAPTEUR INTEGRE | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2008 | Translation filed | 08.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 29.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000000231 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK) [X] 1,16,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003050573 (KUHR HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,16,17 * paragraphs [0045] - [0112] *; | [A]US2004158271 (HAMAMOTO KATSUMI [JP]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0037] - [0074] *; | [A]WO2005000118 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-24* page 9, paragraph last - page 12, paragraph 1 * |