EP1903020 - BIPHENYL DERIVATIVES, ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS, AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICES MADE BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOTA, Mineyuki 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 2990293 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Mitsunori 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 2990293 / JP | 03 /
HOSOKAWA, Chishio 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 2990293 / JP | [2014/12] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
KUBOTA, Mineyuki 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 2990293 / JP | ||
02 /
ITO, Mitsunori 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 2990293 / JP | |||
03 /
HOSOKAWA, Chishio 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba, 2990293 / JP | |||
Former [2008/13] | 01 /
KUBOTA, Mineyuki 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | ||
02 /
ITO, Mitsunori 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | |||
03 /
HOSOKAWA, Chishio 1280, Kamiizumi, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990293 / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06767501.7 | 28.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006JP312884 | Priority number, date | JP20050205522 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005205522 | [2008/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007553 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903020 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903020 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C15/27, C07C15/38, C09K11/06, H01L51/50, C07C15/28, C07C15/30 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C07F7/0807 (EP,US);
C07C13/54 (KR);
C07C13/573 (KR);
C07C15/28 (EP,US);
C07C15/30 (EP,US);
C07C15/38 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K85/626 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US);
C07C2603/26 (EP,US);
C07C2603/50 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1044 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1048 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/324 (EP,US);
H10K85/622 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
H10K85/633 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | C07C15/27, C07C15/38, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | ||
Former IPC [2008/13] | C07C15/27 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIPHENYLDERIVATE, ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE MATERIALIEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2008/13] | English: | BIPHENYL DERIVATIVES, ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS, AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICES MADE BY USING THE SAME | [2008/13] | French: | DERIVES BIPHENYLES, MATERIAUX ORGANIQUES ELECTROLUMINESCENTS, ET DISPOSITIFS ORGANIQUES ELECTROLUMINESCENTS FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE CES MATERIAUX | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2007 | Translation filed | 05.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2006 | AT | 19.03.2014 | BE | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | IT | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IE | 28.06.2014 | LU | 28.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.06.2006 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IE | 28.06.2014 | ||
LU | 28.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IE | 28.06.2014 | ||
LU | 28.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 28.06.2014 | ||
LU | 28.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 28.06.2014 | ||
LU | 28.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 28.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 28.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 28.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US6635364 (IGARASHI TATSUYA [JP]) [XD] 1,3-13 * column 21; compounds 1-24 * * column 26 - column 30; examples 1-19 * * claims 37-55 *; | [XD]EP1491609 (CANON KK [JP]) [XD] 1,2,4-13 * page 13; compound 41 ** page 19 - page 23; examples 1-16 * |