Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
29.08.2008 | Change - extension states | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
05.07.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
07.03.2008 | Change - extension states | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
01.02.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
01.02.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
24.05.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.03.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.02.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.02.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.01.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.01.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.09.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication |