EP1908645 - FOLDING DEVICE AND FOLDING METHOD FOR AIRBAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ashimori Industry Co., Ltd. 10-18, Kitahorie 3-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0014 / JP | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAMURA, Yoshimasa c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | 02 /
SHIMAZAKI, Yoshio c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Kou c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
TERAMURA, Yoshimasa c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome, Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMAZAKI, Yoshio c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome, Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | |||
03 /
SASAKI, Kou c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome, Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | |||
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
TERAMURA, Yoshimasa c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMAZAKI, Yoshio c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome, Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | |||
03 /
SASAKI, Kou c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD Osaka Plant, 11-61, 7-Chome Senrioka, Settsu-City Osaka 5660001 / JP | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06768044.7 | 10.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006JP313682 | Priority number, date | JP20050206697 | 15.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005206697 | [2008/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010776 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908645 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908645 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
B60R21/237 (EP,US);
B60R21/16 (KR);
B60R2021/2375 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FALTVORRICHTUNG UND FALTVERFAHREN FÜR AIRBAGS | [2008/15] | English: | FOLDING DEVICE AND FOLDING METHOD FOR AIRBAG | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF PLIANT ET PROCEDE DE PLIAGE POUR AIRBAG | [2011/44] |
Former [2008/15] | DISPOSITIF PLIANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLIAGE POUR AIRBAG | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2008 | Translation filed | 23.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.08.2009 | Observations by third parties | 16.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | other | WO0015467 |