EP1944411 - PRESS FELT FOR PAPERMAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ichikawa Co., Ltd. 14-15 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHUCHI, Takashi c/o Ichikawa Co., Ltd., 14-15, Hongo 2-Chome, Bunk yo-ku Tokyo 1130033 / JP | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | van Straaten, Joop Octrooibureau Van Straaten B.V. Monseigneur Bosstraat 22 5401 EB Uden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Van Straaten, Joop Octrooibureau Van Straaten B.V. Monseigneur Bosstraat 22 5401 EB Uden / NL | Application number, filing date | 06768454.8 | 09.08.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006JP316060 | Priority number, date | JP20050232034 | 10.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005232034 | [2008/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018313 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944411 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21F7/08 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
D21F7/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, IT, SE [2008/37] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRESSFILZ ZUR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [2008/29] | English: | PRESS FELT FOR PAPERMAKING | [2008/29] | French: | FEUTRE DE PRESSE POUR LA FABRICATION DU PAPIER | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2008 | Translation filed | 06.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 11.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005133185 (DESPAULT MARC P [CA], et al) [X] 1,2* paragraphs [0026] - [0034] * |