|
24.05.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |