26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
16.06.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
15.06.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
24.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
14.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.08.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.10.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
22.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.10.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.07.2009 |
First examination report |
|
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
20.06.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
22.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
22.02.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
13.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|