Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8112804 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2012 | B2 | US2008155694 | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006KR02512 | 28.06.2006 | KR20050061559 | 08.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1902375 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2017 | B1 | EP1902375 | 22.04.2009 | A4 | EP1902375 | 26.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006KR02512 | 28.06.2006 | KR20050061559 | 08.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007007960 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20050061559 | 08.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100663546B | Global Dossier | 02.01.2007 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20050061559 | 08.07.2005 |