EP1913488 - PROGRAMMABLE DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSOR INCLUDING A CLUSTERED SIMD MICROARCHITECTURE CONFIGURED TO EXECUTE COMPLEX VECTOR INSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Sweden AB Teknikringen 10 583 30 Linköping / SE | [2012/49] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Coresonic AB Teknikringen 7 583 30 Linköping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Anders Kindagatan 7 58247 Linköping / SE | 02 /
TELL, Eric Ulvåsavägen 16 S-582 47 Linköping / SE | 03 /
LIU, Dake Hedborns Gata 34 S-582 37 Linköping / SE | [2014/39] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
NILSSON, Anders Vallavägen 6.200 S-582 15 Linköping / SE | ||
02 /
TELL, Eric Ulvåsavägen 16 S-582 47 Linköping / SE | |||
03 /
LIU, Dake Hedborns Gata 34 S-582 37 Linköping / SE | Representative(s) | Rindforth, Petter, et al Fenix Legal KB Östermalmstorg 1, 3tr. SE-114 42 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Rindforth, Petter, et al Fenix Legal AB Stureplan 4c, 4tr 114 35 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Wennborg, Johan, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06769606.2 | 09.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006SE00938 | Priority number, date | US20050201842 | 11.08.2005 Original published format: US 201842 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018468 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913488 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/78, G06F9/302, G06F9/355, G06F9/38, G06F9/32, G06F7/48, H04N5/44, H04N7/26 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
G06F9/30079 (EP,US);
G06F9/3891 (EP,KR,US);
G06F15/7842 (EP,US);
G06F15/8092 (EP,US);
G06F9/30014 (EP,US);
G06F9/30036 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | G06F15/78, G06F17/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | PROGRAMMIERBARER DIGITALER SIGNALPROZESSOR MIT EINER GECLUSTERTEN SIMD-MIKROARCHITEKTUR, DIE DAFÜR AUSGELEGT IST, KOMPLEXVEKTORANWEISUNGEN AUSZUFÜHREN | [2008/17] | English: | PROGRAMMABLE DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSOR INCLUDING A CLUSTERED SIMD MICROARCHITECTURE CONFIGURED TO EXECUTE COMPLEX VECTOR INSTRUCTIONS | [2008/17] | French: | PROCESSEUR DE SIGNAL NUMERIQUE PROGRAMMABLE COMPRENANT UNE MICRO-ARCHITECTURE SIMD EN GRAPPES CONÇUE POUR EXECUTER DES INSTRUCTIONS VECTORIELLES COMPLEXES | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.06.2013 | 18.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/45] | 03.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/45] | Appeal following examination | 30.08.2013 | Appeal received No. T2218/13 | 12.10.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.09.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1777076 ; | [A]US6477555 (HARTUNG JOHN [US]); |