EP1879859 - DIARYLSULFONE SULFONAMIDES AND USE THEROF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOPALSAMY, Ariamala 21 Whispering Pines Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | 02 /
MOORE, William, Jay 108 Fox Run Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 03 /
KERN, Jeffery, Curtis 1344 Second Avenue Gilbertsville, PA 19525 / US | 04 /
MOLINARI, Albert, John 1053 Overlook Drive Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | 05 /
SHI, Mengxiao 17 Morgan Street New Rochelle, NY 10805 / US | 06 /
WELMAKER, Gregory, Scott 132 Persimmon Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 07 /
WILSON, Matthew, Allan 11 Cha Ma Lane Royersford, PA 19468 / US | 08 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Girija 13 Ross Avenue Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977 / US | 09 /
COMMONS, Thomas, Joseph 397 Drummers Lane Wayne, PA 19087 / US | 10 /
WEBB, Michael, Byron 260 Pine Forge Road Douglassville, PA 19518 / US | 11 /
WOODWORTH, Richard, P. 216 S. 4th Street North Wales, PA 19454 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Connelly, Michael John Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [2008/04] | Application number, filing date | 06770422.1 | 12.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US18886 | Priority number, date | US20050681080P | 13.05.2005 Original published format: US 681080 P | US20060432788 | 10.05.2006 Original published format: US 432788 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006124875 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1879859 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/20, C07C317/22, C07C317/26, C07C317/38, A61K31/445 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
C07F9/3882 (EP,US);
C07C317/20 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C317/14 (EP,US);
C07C317/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07C317/26 (KR);
C07C317/38 (KR);
C07D213/42 (EP,US);
C07D233/54 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07F9/4056 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2602/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIARYLSULFON-SULFONAMIDE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2008/04] | English: | DIARYLSULFONE SULFONAMIDES AND USE THEROF | [2008/04] | French: | SULFAMIDES DE DIARYLSULFONE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1164829 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [X] 1,11,12,29 * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]DE19920790 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-52 * examples; claims *; | [Y]WO02072570 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-52 * examples; claims *; | [Y]WO2005000244 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-52 * examples; claims *; | [X] - R.CREMLYN, "Chlorosulfonation of some Diphenyl Derivatives", PHOSPHORUS AND SULFUR, (1982), vol. 12, pages 341 - 352, XP001247192 [X] 1,11,12,29 * page 343; compound 13 * | [Y] - CHANG GI CHO ET AL, "Synthesis and Characterization of poly(arylene ether sulfone) copolymers", POLYMER PREPRINTS, (2003), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 649 - 650, XP001247597 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - H.HORSTMANN, "Chemische Struktur und diuretische Wirkung in der Reihe der 4-Chlor-3-sulfonamido-benzolsulfonamide", ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG, (1967), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 653 - 659, XP009074175 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - A.V. TARASOV ET AL, "New 6-Arylsulfonyl-1,2-Benzoisothiazol-3(2H)-one 1,1-dioxides", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS, (2003), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 119 - 122, XP001247598 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - V.CECCHETTI ET AL, "o-Chlorobenzenesulfonamidic derivatives", J.MED.CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, pages 157 - 161, XP009074112 [Y] 1-52 * page 157; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00053a020 | [Y] - H.KORNOWSKI ET AL, "Méthyl-4 oxadiazines-1,2,4 diones-3,5", CHIMIE THERAPEUTIQUE, (1966), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 353 - 355, XP009074104 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - G.PAPPALARDO, "Azione degli idrati alcalini sugli o-amino-difenildisolfuri simmetrici e sintesi di fenotiazine sulfonamidiche", GAZZETTA CHIMICA ITALIANA, (1960), vol. 90, pages 648 - 659, XP009074103 [Y] 1-52 * page 649; compound VI * |