Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009108874 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2010 | A3 | WO2009108874 | 03.09.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US3192808 | 27.02.2008 | US3226108 | 28.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012085392 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | US91992609 | 27.02.2009 | WO2009US35503 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011066562 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | WO2006US19862 | 22.05.2006 | US91992606 | 22.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009320088 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91862006 | 30.03.2006 | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | WO2006US12055 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4809425B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2011 | B2 | JP2008542879 | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | WO2006US19862 | 22.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4643707B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2011 | B2 | JP2008542872 | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | WO2006US12055 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2250678 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US3192808 | 27.02.2008 | US3226108 | 28.02.2008 | WO2009US35503 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891524 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2010 | A4 | EP1891524 | 27.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | WO2006US12055 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1899908 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2010 | A4 | EP1899908 | 19.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | WO2006US19862 | 22.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006127676 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2007 | A3 | WO2006127676 | 30.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006127135 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A3 | WO2006127135 | 30.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5270655B | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | B2 | JP2011076629 | 14.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US68392805 | 23.05.2005 |