EP1888098 - GLYCOPEGYLATED ERYTHROPOIETIN FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neose Technologies, Inc. 102 Witmer Road Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFREES, Shawn 126 Filly Drive North Wales, PA 19454 / US | 02 /
BAYER, Robert 6105 Dirac Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 03 /
ZOPE, David, A 560 Beechtree Lane Wayne, PA 19087 / US | 04 /
KANG, Jichao 3 Kentsdale Drive Pennington, NJ 08534 / US | 05 /
WILLETT, Walter, Scott, Jr. 3820 Comley Circle Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06771180.4 | 25.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US20257 | Priority number, date | US20050684637P | 25.05.2005 Original published format: US 684637 P | US20050685007P | 25.05.2005 Original published format: US 685007 P | US20050687548P | 02.06.2005 Original published format: US 687548 P | US20050144223 | 02.06.2005 Original published format: US 144223 | US20060764625P | 01.02.2006 Original published format: US 764625 P | US20060774088P | 15.02.2006 Original published format: US 774088 P | US20060773941P | 15.02.2006 Original published format: US 773941 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006127910 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1888098 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K47/549 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLYKOPEGYLIERTE ERYTHROPOETIN-FORMULIERUNGEN | [2008/08] | English: | GLYCOPEGYLATED ERYTHROPOIETIN FORMULATIONS | [2008/08] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'ERYTHROPOIETINE GLYCOPEGYLEES | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 14.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - LONG D.L. ET AL., "Design of homogeneous, monopegylated erythropoietin analogs with preserved in vitro bioactivity", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, (2006), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 697 - 704, XP005504760 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exphem.2006.02.011 | [A] - DEGREES S. ET AL., "GlycoPEGylation of recombinant therapeutic proteins produced in Escherichia coli", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 16, no. 9, pages 833 - 843, XP002403450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/cwl004 |