EP1889124 - BROADBAND IMAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yacoubian, Araz P.O. Box 230268 Encinitas, CA 92023 / US | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/01] |
Former [2008/08] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06771262.0 | 26.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US20381 | Priority number, date | US20050685236P | 26.05.2005 Original published format: US 685236 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006127971 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1889124 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/06, H04N5/30, G01N21/17 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/1702 (EP,US);
G03B19/16 (EP,US);
H04N5/30 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1706 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1708 (EP,US);
G01N2021/178 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | G03B42/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREITBAND-DARSTELLER | [2008/08] | English: | BROADBAND IMAGER | [2008/08] | French: | IMAGEUR A LARGE BANDE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/28] | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2010 | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2011 | 31.05.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4255971 (ROSENCWAIG ALLAN); | [X]US4727420 (KOHDA KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]US4378497 (GIALLORENZI THOMAS G); | [Y]US4847854 (VAN DIJK JOHANNES W [GB]); | [Y]EP0576104 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US6292682 (KRUGER ROBERT A [US]); | [Y]US2002097962 (YOSHIMURA TETSUZO [JP], et al); | [Y]US6504289 (TODA MINORU [US], et al); | [A]US2003012478 (POKROVSKI ALEXEI ANDREEVICH [RU], et al); | [Y]WO03059168 (ULTRAZONIX DNT AB [SE], et al); | [Y]EP1051536 (RICHARDSON TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]); | [A]US6662040 (HENRICHS PAUL MARK [US], et al); | [X]US2004220465 (CAFARELLA JOHN H [US]); | [Y]US6848295 (AUNER GREGORY W [US], et al) |